skip to content

The Reimer Clinic - Ottawa

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1280 Old Innes Road
Unit 802-803
Ottawa Ontario K1B 5M7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 28, 2016 Pass View PDF
Apr 19, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 18, 2015 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Aug 13, 2013 Pass View PDF
Jun 10, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF