Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Nov 10, 2022
|
In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 03, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 24, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 04, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 13, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|