skip to content

Spamedica Canada Yorkville

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
66 Avenue Road
Suite 4
Toronto Ontario M5R 3N8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 08, 2021 Pass View PDF
Mar 19, 2021 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 07, 2017 Pass View PDF
Apr 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 05, 2012 Pass View PDF