Orleans Clinic of Orthopaedic Medicine
The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.
Summary
Current Business Address:
2555 St. Joseph Blvd
Suite 403
Orléans
Ontario
K1C 1S6
Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Nov 13, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 25, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 02, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 13, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 06, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|