Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Oct 27, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 13, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 25, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 02, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 13, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 06, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|