skip to content

Canadian Vein Institute- Mississauga

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1370 Dundas St E
Suite 206
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4G4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 08, 2021 Withdrawal
Sep 17, 2020 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 25, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 23, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 01, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Sep 20, 2012 Pass View PDF