skip to content

Downsview Endoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M6L 3C9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 03, 2019 Pending
Jan 25, 2018 Pass View PDF
Oct 27, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
May 17, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 15, 2015 Pass View PDF
May 25, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 23, 2013 Pass View PDF