skip to content

U Cosmetic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1324 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 3E2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 08, 2021 Withdrawal
Sep 12, 2019 Pass View PDF
Aug 20, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 28, 2017 Pass View PDF
May 23, 2012 Pass View PDF