Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Dec 14, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 26, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 18, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 23, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 27, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 10, 2014
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|