Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Oct 16, 2020
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Nov 29, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 09, 2019
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 18, 2017
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 25, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|