skip to content

Women's Care Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 501
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Mar 19, 2019 Pass View PDF
May 30, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 05, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Aug 17, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 18, 2012 Pass View PDF