Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Sep 13, 2023
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to operate)
|
|
Nov 20, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 10, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 02, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 15, 2013
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|