skip to content

Toronto Cosmetic Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
5400 Yonge Street
Unit 110
Toronto Ontario M2N 5R5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 24, 2018 Pass View PDF
May 17, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Oct 17, 2017 Pass View PDF
Jun 26, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 25, 2012 Pass View PDF