skip to content

Dr. K.S. Billing Pain Management Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1601 River Road East
Unit 30B
Kitchener Ontario N2A 3Y4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 01, 2018 Withdrawal
Sep 06, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Aug 03, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Jul 09, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 31, 2014 Pass View PDF
Apr 27, 2012 Pass View PDF