skip to content

GHA Surgical Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 09, 2018 Pass View PDF
Oct 27, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 06, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 15, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF