skip to content

Karma IVF

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
Medical Centre 2
435 The Boardwalk
Suite 508
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 26, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Apr 08, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 15, 2015 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jan 29, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 05, 2013 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF