skip to content

Kingston Medical Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Aug 29, 2018 Withdrawal
Jul 03, 2018 Pass View PDF
Apr 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 21, 2016 Pass View PDF
Apr 07, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 16, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 15, 2012 Pass View PDF