skip to content

FACE Cosmetic Surgery

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
251 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 13, 2024 Pass (OHP allowed to operate) View PDF
Nov 25, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 25, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 20, 2020 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 26, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 04, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 18, 2017 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
May 25, 2015 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 10, 2014 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jan 23, 2013 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF