skip to content

West GTA Endoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Sheridan Centre-Unit 183
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2H7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 11, 2021 Pass View PDF
Mar 03, 2021 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 29, 2018 Pass View PDF
Apr 24, 2017 Pass View PDF
Sep 10, 2012 Pass View PDF