NeuPath Centre for Pain & Spine (Mississauga)
The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.
Summary
Current Business Address:
6400 Millcreek Drive
Unit 9
Missussauga
Ontario
L5N 3E7
Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
May 20, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 04, 2017
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 21, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 09, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 15, 2011
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|