Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
May 30, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
|
Apr 24, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 29, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 27, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 08, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 27, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 26, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 09, 2016
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 24, 2016
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 20, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|