Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Nov 03, 2021
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Oct 20, 2021
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 28, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 29, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 25, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 01, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 31, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|