skip to content

Create Fertility Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
790 Bay Street, Suite 1100
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 08, 2021 Pass View PDF
Mar 19, 2021 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 20, 2016 Pass View PDF
May 17, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 21, 2011 Pass View PDF