Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Nov 25, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 20, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 07, 2017
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 28, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 23, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 01, 2014
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 22, 2011
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|