skip to content

Barrie Endoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Lower Level 1
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 27, 2017 Pass View PDF
Sep 07, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 10, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 23, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 30, 2012 Pass View PDF