Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Mar 05, 2020
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Jun 28, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 19, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 18, 2015
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 13, 2013
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 10, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|