skip to content

TRIO Fertility Inc

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
655 Bay Street
Suite 1800
Toronto Ontario M5G 2K4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 11, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Mar 01, 2018 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 10, 2016 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 14, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF