skip to content

Beautiful One Cosmetic and Anti-Aging Clinic - Mississauga

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1675 The Chase
Unit 30
Mississauga Ontario L5M 5Y7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 02, 2019 Pending
Aug 28, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 15, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 25, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 06, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF