Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Apr 10, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 09, 2020
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 21, 2020
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 02, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 27, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 08, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 24, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 14, 2013
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 28, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|