Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
May 15, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 16, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 18, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 26, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 20, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 21, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 24, 2015
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 25, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 08, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|