Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Nov 25, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 27, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 20, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 20, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 04, 2020
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 22, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 25, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 27, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 17, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 15, 2015
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 25, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 23, 2013
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|