skip to content

Aestheticare

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
15 Mountain Avenue South
Suite 312
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2V6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Mar 08, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Jan 29, 2018 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Dec 04, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 03, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 27, 2016 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 09, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF