Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jul 27, 2022
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to operate)
|
|
Mar 08, 2022
|
In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
|
|
Jan 29, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 04, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 03, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 27, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 09, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|