Headache, Migraine & Pain Treatment Centre
The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.
Summary
Current Business Address:
555 Kingston Road West, 1st Floor
Ajax
Ontario
L1S 6M1
Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Dec 08, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 19, 2015
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 08, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 22, 2014
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 15, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|