Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Apr 15, 2019
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Oct 03, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 16, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 26, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 20, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 02, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 04, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 04, 2011
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|