skip to content

Toronto Pain Management Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
145 Front Street East
G1
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Nov 29, 2018 Pass View PDF
Nov 05, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 17, 2014 Pass View PDF
Jan 08, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 09, 2013 Pass View PDF
Jun 10, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF