skip to content

Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
4610 Highway 7
Suite 200
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 22, 2022 Pass (OHP allowed to operate) View PDF
Apr 28, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Oct 18, 2021 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 05, 2019 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 09, 2016 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 18, 2011 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF