skip to content

Eye Face Institute

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
4789 Yonge Street
Suite 316
North York Ontario M2N 0G3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 22, 2021 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 27, 2021 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 21, 2020 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Sep 04, 2020 Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 09, 2020 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 21, 2016 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF