Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Sep 06, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 22, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 27, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 21, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 04, 2020
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 09, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 21, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|