skip to content

FACE Cosmetic Surgery

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
251 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 18, 2017 Pass View PDF
May 25, 2015 Pass View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 10, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 23, 2013 Pass View PDF