skip to content

York Diagnostic Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
3585 Keele Street
Unit 4
North York Ontario M3J 3H5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 25, 2020 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 10, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Dec 04, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jan 18, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 10, 2016 Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 09, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF