Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jul 26, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 25, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 10, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 04, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 18, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 10, 2016
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 09, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|