skip to content

London Scoping Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
310 Wellington Road South
London Ontario N6C 4P4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Mar 18, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 07, 2020 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 25, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
May 30, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 31, 2017 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 23, 2017 Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 07, 2016 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 09, 2016 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 19, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 31, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jan 23, 2013 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF