Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Feb 03, 2023
|
In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
|
|
Mar 18, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 07, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 25, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 30, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 31, 2017
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 23, 2017
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 07, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 09, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 19, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 31, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 23, 2013
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|