Algoma Sports Medicine and Physical Injuries Clinic
The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.
Summary
Current Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Suite 105
Sault Ste. Marie
Ontario
P6A 1Y5
Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jan 24, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 25, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 26, 2015
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 24, 2014
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 28, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|