Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Oct 13, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 22, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 06, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 19, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 28, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 27, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|