skip to content

VenaClinica - Bayview Avenue

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
16700 Bayview Avenue
Suite 100
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 11, 2018 Pass View PDF
Oct 03, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 25, 2012 Pass View PDF