skip to content

North York Endoscopy Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Unit B19
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 08, 2019 Pass View PDF
Oct 27, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 02, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass View PDF
Jan 25, 2012 Pass View PDF