skip to content

Intestinal Health Institute

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
8312 McCowan Road
Suite 205
Markham Ontario L3P 8E1

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 28, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Oct 18, 2021 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 26, 2017 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 30, 2016 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 23, 2016 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 30, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF