Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jul 22, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 28, 2022
|
In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
|
|
Oct 18, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 26, 2017
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 30, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 23, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 30, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|